Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Louis Joseph D’Hautpoul

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cahors, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1764Born
19 Dec 178925.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 182863.6SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
23 Jun 182863.8ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
27 Jul 182863.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
15 Mar 184277.6RetiredBishop of Cahors, France
8 Dec 184985.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Paul Louis Joseph D’Hautpoul
Bishop Paul Louis Joseph D’Hautpoul (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCahuzac-sur-Vère

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast