Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Dijon

Archidioecesis Divionensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Roland Minnerath, Archbishop
  • Michel Louis Coloni, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8 December 2002
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 8,760 (3,383 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Est
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-dijon.com/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 20 rue du Petit-Potet, 21000 Dijon, France
  • Telephone: 3.80.63.16.73
  • Fax: 3.80.63.16.79

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Dijon
9 April 1731ErectedDiocese of Dijon (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Langres (suppressed) Diocese of Dijon
Diocese of Troyes
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Dijon Diocese of Langres
Archdiocese of Dijon
8 December 2002ElevatedDiocese of Dijon Archdiocese of Dijon

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Dijon
1950325,000335,60296.8%34180421771123866727ap1951
1970423,688432,28898.0%317643811,112139820523ap1971
1980396,094470,35084.2%249322811,409263625526ap1981
1990395,000483,00081.8%230302601,519650460527ap1991
1999415,576506,80082.0%178552331,78327101377527ap2000
2000413,027506,78281.5%184542381,73526107382527ap2001
2001410,493506,78281.0%171542251,82429109385527ap2002
Archdiocese of Dijon
2002408,973506,78380.7%64581223,3522898300527ap2003
2003408,466506,78280.6%162542161,8912678280527ap2004
2004329,408506,78265.0%166532191,5042569292720ap2005
2006330,000506,78265.1%156572131,5492492257720ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013