Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Lazare Seguin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang]

Titular Bishop of Pinara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1868BornMenessaire, France
10 Sep 188820.6ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Jul 189224.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Feb 190739.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China
23 Feb 190739.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinara
6 Oct 190739.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinara
21 Oct 191345.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China
3 Dec 192456.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang], China
11 Sep 194274.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang], China

MicroData Summary for François-Lazare Seguin:
Bishop François-Lazare Seguin M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kweyang [Guiyang]

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013