Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-François-Marie Carlo, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Anlong [Lanlung]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1881BornHénon, France
29 Jun 190524.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Nov 192241.5AppointedPrefect of Lanlung [Anlong], China
21 Apr 192745.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lanlung [Anlong], China
29 Apr 192745.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
16 Oct 192746.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
11 Apr 194664.9AppointedBishop of Anlong [Lanlung], China
26 Jan 195270.7DiedBishop of Anlong [Lanlung], China

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-François-Marie Carlo:
Bishop Alexandre-François-Marie Carlo M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Anlong [Lanlung]

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015