Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Léonard Pérocheau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Maxula Prates


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1787BornLes Sables-d'Olonne, France
1812¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Oct 181730.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China
3 Oct 181730.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
1 Feb 181831.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
11 Jul 183851.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China
4 Apr 185669.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China
6 May 186174.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Léonard Pérocheau:
Bishop Jacques-Léonard Pérocheau M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013