Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ponsot, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Yünnan, China

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1803Born
19 Sep 182926.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 Aug 184037.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yünnan, China
28 Aug 184037.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
11 Jun 184340.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philomelium
17 Nov 188077.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Yünnan, China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ponsot
Bishop Joseph Ponsot M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Yünnan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVy-le-Ferroux, Archdiocese of Besançon, France
Ordained BishopTsongking
Death PlaceLong-ki

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 26
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast