Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie Chauveau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Thibet

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1816BornLuçon, France
22 Sep 183822.6Ordained PriestPriest
1843¹26.9ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Mar 184630.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Yünnan, China
27 Mar 184630.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
21 Sep 185034.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
9 Sep 186448.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
21 Dec 187761.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Chauveau:
Bishop Joseph-Marie Chauveau M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Thibet

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013