Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kangding [Kangting]

Dioecesis Camtimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 160,000 (61,800 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Kangding, Sichuan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Lhassa
27 March 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Lhassa (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Thibet
28 July 1868Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Lhassa Vicariate Apostolic of Thibet
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Thibet
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangkok
Vicariate Apostolic of Tatsienlu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Tatsienlu
15 February 1929Territory LostArchdiocese of Calcutta
Vicariate Apostolic of Tatsienlu
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Sikkim (erected)
Diocese of Kangding [Kangting]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tatsienlu Diocese of Kangding [Kangting]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Kangding [Kangting]
19505,8704,000,000.1%610163663038ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.5, 1 Jan 2013; data: 5 Jan 2013