Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignazio Camillo Guglielmo Maria Pietro Cardinal Persico, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1823BornNapoli, Italy
25 Apr 184017.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jan 184623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Mar 185431.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
8 Mar 185431.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
4 Jun 185431.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
19 Dec 185633.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
24 Jun 186037.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
11 Mar 187047.1AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
25 Aug 187249.6ResignedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
23 Jun 187451.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bolina
15 Jul 187451.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
26 Mar 187956.2SucceededBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
5 Mar 1887³64.1ResignedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
14 Mar 188764.1AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
14 Mar 188764.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
20 Mar 188966.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
13 Jun 189168.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
16 Jan 189370.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 189370.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
30 May 189370.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
7 Dec 189572.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Camillo Guglielmo Maria Pietro Persico:
Cardinal Ignazio Camillo Guglielmo Maria Pietro Persico O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect of Indulgences and Relics

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 115, and Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 239, and Page 504
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013