Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastasius (Alois) Hartmann, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Derbe

Vicar Apostolic of Patna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1803BornAltwis, Switzerland
182117.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Sep 182522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Sep 184542.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India
30 Sep 184542.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
15 Mar 184643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
13 Dec 184946.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
8 Mar 185451.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India
25 Jul 185855.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
24 Jan 186056.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India
24 Apr 186663.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Patna, India

MicroData Summary for Anastasius (Alois) Hartmann (VIAF: 20474974)
Bishop Anastasius (Alois) Hartmann O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bombay

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 174
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016