Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Antoine Anfossi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangalore, India

Titular Bishop of Mennith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1799Born
29 Sep 181616.9ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Mar 185353.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bangalore, India
15 Mar 185353.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
15 May 185353.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mennith
Jun 1870³70.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bangalore, India
22 Dec 187879.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangalore, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel-Antoine Anfossi
Bishop Michel-Antoine Anfossi O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Remo, Liguria, Italy
Ordained BishopBombay, Vicariate Apostolic of Bombay

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 380
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017