Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Marie Dépommier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Coimbatore

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1815BornLes Clefs, France
21 Sep 183924.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
17 Feb 186550.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coimbatore, India
17 Feb 186550.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
8 Oct 186550.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
8 Dec 187358.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Claude-Marie Dépommier:
Bishop Claude-Marie Dépommier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013