Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Bonnand, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India

Titular Bishop of Druzipara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1796Born
17 Jun 182125.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 182327.4ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Aug 183135.2AppointedCoadjutor Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India
19 Aug 183135.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Druzipara
10 Nov 183337.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druzipara
8 Jul 183640.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India
3 Oct 183640.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India
1850²53.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India
21 Mar 186164.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clément Bonnand (VIAF: 15610063)
Bishop Clément Bonnand M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Pondicherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Maurice-sur-Dargoire, France

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,833, Number 46
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 536, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 723, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,120, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast