Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Canoz, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trichinopoly, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1805Born
24 Aug 183226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 May 184640.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India
22 May 184640.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamasus
29 Jun 184741.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamasus
25 Nov 188681.2AppointedBishop of Trichinopoly, India
2 Dec 188883.2DiedBishop of Trichinopoly, India

MicroData Summary for Alexis Canoz (VIAF: 8336085)
Bishop Alexis Canoz S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Trichinopoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSellières, France

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017