Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Pagnani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kandy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1834BornFabriano, Italy
Dec 1857³23.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Nov 187945.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka
11 Nov 187945.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
25 Dec 187945.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
20 Apr 188348.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kandy, Sri Lanka
25 Nov 188652.4AppointedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
27 Jun 191177.0DiedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clemente Pagnani:
Bishop Clemente Pagnani O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Kandy

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 302, and Page 327
  • op/c1: Website of the Diocese, 19 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013