Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Brunelli

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1795Born
Nov 1817³22.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
21 Dec 181722.4Ordained PriestPriest
Jan 1843³47.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
23 May 184549.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
25 May 184549.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
13 Apr 184751.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Spain
22 Jul 184853.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
15 Mar 185256.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
7 Mar 185357.7Elevated to Cardinal
7 Mar 185357.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
22 Dec 185358.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
23 Jun 185459.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
18 Sep 185661.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
21 Feb 186165.6DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Brunelli (VIAF: 89733105)
Giovanni Cardinal Brunelli (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Vallicela, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceOsimo, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Osimo, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134, and Page 47
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 24
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1852
  • x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 20, and Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast