Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Fernández Cortina

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1798BornPendueles
1825¹26.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 184748.8SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
4 Oct 184748.9ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Feb 184849.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
31 Mar 185455.4DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Fernández Cortina:
Bishop Joaquín Fernández Cortina (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 510
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 152, Number 831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013