Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan José Cardinal Bonel y Orbe

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1782BornPinos del Rey
1805¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest of Granada, Spain
27 Nov 183048.6SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
28 Feb 183148.9ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
12 Jun 183149.2Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
29 Jul 183351.3AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
18 Oct 183856.5SelectedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
12 Sep 184765.4SelectedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
4 Oct 184765.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
30 Sep 185068.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 185472.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
11 Feb 185774.9DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Juan José Bonel y Orbe (VIAF: 88854104)
Juan José Cardinal Bonel y Orbe (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 225, and Page 558
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 May 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 163, and Page 250
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,380
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 147, Number 803
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 13
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1850

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016