Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antolín García Lozano

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1779Born
12 May 185171.6SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
5 Sep 185172.0ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
16 Nov 185172.2Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
15 May 185272.7DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antolín García Lozano
Bishop Antolín García Lozano (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtienza, Diocese of Sigüenza
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,708
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,853
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 491
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 160, Number 875
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018