Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Tomás Iglesias y Bárcones

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1803BornVillafranca del Bierzo
25 Jan 185046.4SelectedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
20 May 185046.7ConfirmedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
8 Sep 185047.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
19 Jan 185248.4SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
31 Aug 185249.0ResignedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
27 Sep 185249.1ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
9 May 187470.7DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Iglesias y Bárcones:
Patriarch Tomás Iglesias y Bárcones (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 321, and Page 385
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 159, Number 870

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013