Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Maria (Nicolaus) Martínez y Sáez, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1812Born
183623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Feb 186552.4SelectedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
27 Mar 186552.5ConfirmedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
11 Jun 186552.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
31 Oct 187361.1DiedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Maria (Nicolaus) Martínez y Sáez (VIAF: 107535237)
Bishop Jacinto Maria (Nicolaus) Martínez y Sáez O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeñacerrada, Spain
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 172, Number 945
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017