Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Romero

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1815¹Born
6 Dec 186449.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Santa Marta, Colombia
8 Jan 186651.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
28 Apr 186752.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
5 Jul 187560.5AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
22 Sep 189176.7DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Romero
Bishop José Romero (born 1815, died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Marta, Diocese of Santa Marta
Ordained BishopLa Habana, Diocese of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 244, and Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017