Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerio Antonio Jiménez (Ximenes)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1805¹Born
13 Mar 186863.1AppointedBishop of Medellín, Colombia
28 Jun 186863.4Ordained BishopBishop of Medellín, Colombia
29 May 187368.4ResignedBishop of Medellín, Colombia
6 Dec 189186.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valerio Antonio Jiménez (Ximenes)
Bishop Valerio Antonio Jiménez (Ximenes) (born 1805, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Medellín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntioquia
Ordained BishopBogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017