Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Joaquín Isaza Ruiz

Deceased

Bishop of Medellín, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1820¹Born
22 Nov 186949.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
22 Nov 186949.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
17 Apr 187050.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
29 May 187353.4SucceededBishop of Medellín, Colombia
29 Dec 187454.9DiedBishop of Medellín, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Joaquín Isaza Ruiz
Bishop José Joaquín Isaza Ruiz (born 1820, died ) Bishop of Medellín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio Negro, Diocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopMedellin, Diocese of Medellín

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 266, and Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017