Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Antonio Chaves, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

Titular Bishop of Calydon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1788¹BornVélez
20 Jan 183446.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
20 Jan 183446.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
25 Jul 183446.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
3 Mar 185668.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jose Antonio Chaves
Bishop Jose Antonio Chaves O.F.M. Obs. (born 1788, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 128
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016