Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Cuero y Caicedo, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1780BornCali
6 Nov 180322.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Observant Friars Minor
21 Nov 180323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
23 May 184261.5AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
18 Sep 184261.8Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
7 Aug 185170.7DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fernando Cuero y Caicedo
Bishop Fernando Cuero y Caicedo O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Popayán

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016