Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Jorge de Torres y Estans

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1772BornCartagena
1796¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 183664.6AppointedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
21 May 183765.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
19 Apr 185381.0DiedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Jorge de Torres y Estans:
Bishop José Jorge de Torres y Estans (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Pamplona

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013