Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Elías Puyana

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1788BornBucaramanga
15 Dec 181123.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 184961.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Popayán, Colombia
28 Sep 184961.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Corada
7 Apr 185061.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corada
15 Apr 185970.7AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
20 Nov 186476.3DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Elías Puyana:
Bishop José Elías Puyana (born , died ) Bishop of Pasto

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 181, and Page 443

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013