Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Antonio Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1791BornPopayán
26 Jul 181726.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jul 181726.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184351.6AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
17 Jan 184654.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Cuenca, Ecuador
20 May 185058.9AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
8 Sep 185059.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
20 Dec 185362.5AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
18 Dec 186675.5DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pedro Antonio Torres:
Bishop Pedro Antonio Torres (born , died ) Bishop of Popayán

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 186, and Page 462
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013