Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pasto

Dioecesis Pastopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 April 1859
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Popayán
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 6,813 (2,631 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Carrera 24 No 17-70, Pasto [Narino], Colombia
  • Telephone: (92) 7232.228; 7233.226
  • Fax: 7235.055

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 April 1859ErectedDiocese of Popayán Diocese of Pasto (erected)
1 May 1927Territory LostDiocese of Cali
Diocese of Pasto
Prefecture Apostolic of Tumaco (erected)
23 September 1964Territory LostDiocese of Pasto Diocese of Ipiales (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950399,200400,00099.8%81731542,59211528755ap1951
1966315,000350,00090.0%66441102,8639151343ap1967
1968344,000348,39698.7%59461053,2768443840ap1971
1976380,546385,19098.8%5344973,9237228449ap1977
1980397,129408,58997.2%54481023,8937325049ap1981
1990538,894540,09399.8%69311005,38816239850ap1991
1999730,000741,00098.5%86351216,03315128457ap2000
2000740,000751,00098.5%89391285,78116021557ap2001
2001697,500750,00093.0%89391285,44915921561ap2002
2002707,800765,30092.5%88391275,57315931761ap2003
2003710,300775,80091.6%94391335,34065932061ap2004
2004650,000730,00089.0%91421334,887610725762ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 22 Jun 2013