Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José de Jesús Cardinal Pimiento Rodriguez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manizales, Colombia

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1919Born
14 Dec 194122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
14 Jun 195536.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pasto, Colombia
14 Jun 195536.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonis
28 Aug 195536.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonis
30 Dec 195940.8AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
29 Feb 196445.0AppointedBishop of Garzón-Neiva, Colombia
22 May 197556.2AppointedArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
15 Oct 199677.6RetiredArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
14 Feb 201595.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201595.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto
3 Sep 2019100.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manizales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Pimiento Rodriguez
José de Jesús Cardinal Pimiento Rodriguez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manizales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZapatoca, Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Death PlaceCasa San José, Floridablanca, Archdiocese of Bucaramanga

  • a priest for 77.7 years
  • a bishop for 64.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,955, Number 67
  • c1: CB, 22 Dec 2014
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • d: CB, 3 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast