Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciro Alfonso Gómez Serrano

Deceased

Bishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1918Born
7 Dec 194123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
8 Apr 196142.4AppointedBishop of Girardot, Colombia
28 May 196142.5Ordained BishopBishop of Girardot, Colombia
24 Jul 197253.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
24 Jul 197253.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Elepla
25 Oct 197557.0SucceededBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
19 Jan 198061.2DiedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ciro Alfonso Gómez Serrano
Bishop Ciro Alfonso Gómez Serrano (born , died ) Bishop of Socorro y San Gil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZapatoca

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast