Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro José Rivera Mejía

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1906Born
24 Jun 192923.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 195145.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
25 Jun 195145.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Edistiana
9 Sep 195145.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Edistiana
20 Feb 195346.8AppointedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
25 Oct 197569.4ResignedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
16 Jun 198781.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Rivera Mejía
Bishop Pedro José Rivera Mejía (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Socorro y San Gil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeira

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jul 2021

Quantcast