Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Manizales

Archidioecesis Manizalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 May 1954
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 3,848 (1,486 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Carrera 23 N. 19-22, Manizales, Caldas, Colombia
  • Telephone: (968)84.01.14; 84.01.51
  • Fax: 82.18.53

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Manizales
11 April 1900ErectedDiocese of Medellín Diocese of Manizales (erected)
17 December 1952Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Chocó
Diocese of Manizales
Diocese of Armenia (erected)
17 December 1952Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Chocó
Diocese of Manizales
Diocese of Pereira (erected)
Archdiocese of Manizales
10 May 1954ElevatedDiocese of Manizales Archdiocese of Manizales
29 March 1984Territory LostDiocese of Barrancabermeja
Diocese of Facatativá
Archdiocese of Manizales
Diocese of La Dorada-Guaduas (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Manizales
1950949,000950,00099.9%167602274,18016070264ap1967
Archdiocese of Manizales
1965780,000783,20199.6%184882722,86717978957ap1967
1970749,000750,00099.9%173952682,79414055964ap1971
1976612,182615,18299.5%161512122,88710792568ap1977
1980610,556618,17798.8%151512023,0228789069ap1981
1990549,000556,00098.7%135481833,00086935562ap1991
1999796,345840,34594.8%143491924,147228549572ap2002
2002815,000840,00097.0%132541864,381289742978ap2003
2003731,000750,00097.5%158512093,4973413139581ap2004
2004731,000750,00097.5%163452083,5143410939580ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Aug 2014