Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonzalo Restrepo Restrepo

Archbishop of Manizales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1947 BornUrrao
1 Jun 197426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
12 Dec 200356.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
12 Dec 200356.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
11 Feb 200456.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
11 Jul 200658.9AppointedBishop of Girardota, Colombia
16 Jul 200961.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Manizales, Colombia
7 Oct 200962.2InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Manizales, Colombia
7 Oct 201063.2SucceededArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Restrepo Restrepo:
Archbishop Gonzalo Restrepo Restrepo (born ) Archbishop of Manizales

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Manizales.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,531
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2006
  • s: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013