Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernán Giraldo Jaramillo

Bishop Emeritus of Buga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1936 BornManizales
15 Aug 196427.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 198447.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pereira, Colombia
27 Jun 198447.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alexanum
6 Aug 198447.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alexanum
7 Jul 198750.7AppointedBishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia
19 Jan 200164.2AppointedBishop of Buga, Colombia
10 May 201275.5RetiredBishop of Buga, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Hernán Giraldo Jaramillo:
Bishop Hernán Giraldo Jaramillo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Buga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015