Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Darío Cardinal Castrillón Hoyos

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1929 BornMedellín
26 Oct 195223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
2 Jun 197141.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pereira, Colombia
2 Jun 197141.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
18 Jul 197142.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
1 Jul 197647.0SucceededBishop of Pereira, Colombia
16 Dec 199263.4AppointedArchbishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
15 Jun 199666.9ResignedArchbishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
15 Jun 199666.9AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
21 Feb 199868.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199868.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano
23 Feb 199868.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
23 Feb 199868.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano
13 Apr 200070.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
2 Apr 200575.7CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
2 Apr 200575.7CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
21 Apr 200575.8ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
21 Apr 200575.8ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
31 Oct 200677.3RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
1 Mar 200878.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano
8 Jul 200980.0RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

MicroData Summary for Darío Castrillón Hoyos:
Cardinal Darío Castrillón Hoyos (born ) President Emeritus of “Ecclesia Dei”

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2009
  • i: Bollettino, 21 Feb 1998
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013