Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Hernando García Peláez

Bishop of Garagoa, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1958 Born
2 Jun 198526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pereira, Colombia
11 Feb 200546.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
11 Feb 200546.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
2 Apr 200546.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
5 Jun 201051.8AppointedBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
24 Jul 201051.9InstalledBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
15 Jun 201758.8AppointedBishop of Garagoa, Colombia
8 Jul 201758.9InstalledBishop of Garagoa, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Julio Hernando García Peláez
Bishop Julio Hernando García Peláez (born ) Bishop of Garagoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnserma, Diocese of Pereira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Garagoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,845
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017