Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tulio Duque Gutiérrez, S.D.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Pereira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1935 BornPácora
26 Mar 196631.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
7 Oct 199358.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
7 Oct 199358.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitipa
13 Nov 199358.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitipa
18 Mar 199762.1AppointedBishop of Apartadó, Colombia
25 Jul 200166.5AppointedBishop of Pereira, Colombia
15 Jul 201176.5RetiredBishop of Pereira, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Tulio Duque Gutiérrez:
Bishop Tulio Duque Gutiérrez S.D.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pereira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pereira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013