Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Héctor Rueda Hernández

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1920BornMogotes
15 Dec 194626.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 196039.5AppointedBishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
19 Jun 196039.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
14 Dec 197454.1AppointedArchbishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
7 Nov 199171.0AppointedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
13 Feb 199776.3RetiredArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
1 Nov 201191.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Héctor Rueda Hernández:
Archbishop Héctor Rueda Hernández (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 51.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: CB, 1 Nov 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 68
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014