Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Prada Sanmiguel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Duitama-Sogamoso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1939BornFloridablanca
6 Feb 196626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bucaramanga, Colombia
20 Jan 198848.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
20 Jan 198848.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
20 Feb 198848.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana
21 Jun 199454.4AppointedBishop of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia
15 Oct 201272.8ResignedBishop of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia
16 Aug 201373.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Prada Sanmiguel:
Bishop Carlos Prada Sanmiguel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Duitama-Sogamoso

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,804
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015