Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Merchán Ladino

Bishop of Vélez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1970 BornMonguí
12 Dec 199525.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia
23 Nov 199626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia
26 Oct 201646.4AppointedBishop of Vélez, Colombia
3 Dec 201646.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vélez, Colombia
17 Dec 201646.6InstalledBishop of Vélez, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Merchán Ladino (VIAF: 311182063)
Bishop Marco Antonio Merchán Ladino (born ) Bishop of Vélez

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vélez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 26 Oct 2016
  • c2: CB, 29 Nov 2016
  • c3+: CB, 3 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016