Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Augusto Castro Quiroga, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tunja, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1942Born
24 Dec 196725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
17 Oct 198644.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo, Colombia
17 Oct 198644.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
29 Nov 198644.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
2 Feb 199855.8AppointedArchbishop of Tunja, Colombia
11 Feb 202077.8RetiredArchbishop of Tunja, Colombia
2 Aug 202280.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tunja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Augusto Castro Quiroga
(VIAF: 50904036; WikiData: Q1499385)
Archbishop Luis Augusto Castro Quiroga I.M.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tunja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Ordained BishopBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Death PlaceClínica Marly, Chía

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,757
  • d: CB, 2 Aug 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 11 Aug 2023