Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Uriel Sanabria Arias

Vicar Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia

Titular Bishop of Burca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1970 BornCiénega
19 Nov 199424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tunja, Colombia
16 Apr 201645.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia
16 Apr 201645.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Burca
22 May 201646.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Burca
25 Jun 201646.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jaime Uriel Sanabria Arias
Bishop Jaime Uriel Sanabria Arias (born ) Vicar Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 18 Apr 2016
  • c2: CB, 21 Apr 2016
  • c3+: CB, 20 May 2016
  • c56: CB, 22 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016