Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mieczyslaw Halka Cardinal Ledóchowski

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno e Poznań

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1822BornGórki
13 Jul 184522.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 185633.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
17 Jun 185633.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
17 Jun 185633.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
17 Jun 185633.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
17 Jun 185633.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
25 Jul 186138.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
25 Jul 186138.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
25 Jul 186138.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
25 Jul 186138.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Peru
25 Jul 186138.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
30 Sep 186138.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
1 Oct 186138.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
3 Nov 186139.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
8 Jan 186643.2AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
15 Mar 187552.4Elevated to Cardinal
7 Apr 187653.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
1 Feb 189269.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
2 Feb 189673.3RetiredArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
30 Nov 189674.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
22 Jul 190279.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Mieczyslaw Halka Ledóchowski:
Cardinal Mieczyslaw Halka Ledóchowski (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
  • a cardinal for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 287, and Page 545
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 49, and Page 50
  • ab/1856: LB, 20 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013