Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Chryzostom Janiszenwski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1818Born
1844¹25.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
26 Jun 187153.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
26 Jun 187153.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
23 Jul 187153.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa
11 Oct 189173.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Chryzostom Janiszenwski
Bishop Jan Chryzostom Janiszenwski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlacePudliszki, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poznań, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017