Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Nepomuk von der Marwitz

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1795Born
10 Apr 183034.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
14 Jan 185761.7SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
3 Aug 185762.2ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
8 Nov 185762.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
29 Mar 188690.9DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Johannes Nepomuk von der Marwitz (VIAF: 300626942)
Bishop Johannes Nepomuk von der Marwitz (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuchlin, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pelplin, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1857, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017