Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaw Dekowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1785BornWentfin
10 Dec 180924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Sep 185064.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Sep 185064.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
8 Dec 185065.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
27 Apr 185468.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Dekowski:
Bishop Stanislaw Dekowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,392
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 506

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013