Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastasius Johannes Sedlag

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1787BornDittmerau
16 Jun 181023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
28 Mar 183345.9SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Jan 183446.7ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
18 May 183447.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
23 Sep 185669.4DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Anastasius Johannes Sedlag:
Bishop Anastasius Johannes Sedlag (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,194
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013