Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Jeschke

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1808Born
22 Dec 183224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Jun 185648.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Jun 185648.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
20 Jul 185648.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
7 Nov 188173.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Jeschke
Bishop Jerzy Jeschke (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirchau, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pelplin, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017